VA SB1166 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0169)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0169)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Juvenile records; confidentiality. Clarifies that the Department of Juvenile Justice may share confidential juvenile records with persons, agencies, and institutions having a legitimate interest regardless of the state in which they are located. The bill also allows the Department to share confidential juvenile records with a requesting party who has custody or is providing supervision for a juvenile and the release of the confidential information is in the interest of maintaining security in a secure facility in a state other than Virginia provided it meets that state's definition of "secure facility."
Title
Juvenile Justice, Department of; confidentiality of records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0169) | |
2011-03-15 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 169 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1166ER) | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-24 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House | |
2011-02-24 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-23 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-21 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-19 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2011-01-17 | Senate: Rereferred to Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-17 | Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101091D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1783 (Same As) 2011-03-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0099)