VA SB121 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Effect on rate when assessment results in tax increase; public hearings. Reduces the minimum advance notice of the public hearing a locality must hold prior to increasing its real property tax when that locality's assessment of real property results in a tax increase from 30 days to 14 days.
Title
Real property tax; notice of public hearing when locality's assessment results in increase.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-01 - House - House: Reported from Finance (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-14 | House: Left in Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2010-03-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2010-03-10 | House: Motion to refer to committee agreed to | |
2010-03-09 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2010-03-08 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2010-03-05 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2010-03-04 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2010-03-03 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2010-03-03 | House: Read third time | |
2010-03-02 | House: Read second time | |
2010-03-01 | House: Reported from Finance (19-Y 3-N) | |
2010-02-17 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #1 | |
2010-02-03 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-02-03 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-03 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) | |
2010-01-22 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-01-21 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-20 | Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-06 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-01-06 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100999D |