VA SB1221 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0219)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Telemedicine services; coverage. Requires insurers, corporations, or health maintenance organizations to cover medically necessary remote patient monitoring services as part of their coverage of telemedicine services to the full extent that these services are available. The bill defines remote patient monitoring services as the delivery of home health services using telecommunications technology to enhance the delivery of home health care, including monitoring of clinical patient data such as weight, blood pressure, pulse, pulse oximetry, blood glucose, and other condition-specific data; medication adherence monitoring; and interactive video conferencing with or without digital image upload. The bill requires the Board of Medical Assistance Services to include in the state plan for medical assistance services a provision for the payment of medical assistance for medically necessary health care services provided through telemedicine services. This bill is identical to HB 1970.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telemedicine services; payment and coverage of services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0219)
2019-03-05 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 219 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-20SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019
2019-02-19SenateSigned by President
2019-02-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-18SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1221ER)
2019-02-18SenateEnrolled
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseRead third time
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-12HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-01SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1221S1
2019-01-31SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19105327D-S1
2019-01-31SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-31SenateRead second time
2019-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29SenateReported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-01-24SenateIncorporates SB1124 (Favola)
2019-01-24SenateCommittee substitute printed 19105327D-S1
2019-01-24SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 1-N)
2019-01-11SenateAssigned Education sub: Health Professions
2019-01-04SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-01-04SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101469D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321325(n/a)See Bill Text
3823418.16(n/a)See Bill Text
5412901(n/a)See Bill Text
5412903(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1221
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1221+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1221S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1221ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0219+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0104+SB1221
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0136+SB1221
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0248SB1221+SB1221
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0286SB1221+SB1221
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H12V0153+SB1221
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2702+SB1221

Bill Comments

feedback