VA SB1234 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0642)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Public institutions of higher education; governing boards; educational programs. Requires educational programs for the governing boards of public institutions of higher education to include presentations relating to (i) board members' primary duty to the citizens of the Commonwealth and (ii) student debt trends.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher educational institutions, public; governing boards, educational programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0642)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 642 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-27 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-27SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019
2019-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-20SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1234ER)
2019-02-20SenateEnrolled
2019-02-15SenateTitle replaced 19106646D-H1
2019-02-15SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N)
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1234H1
2019-02-13HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106646D-H1
2019-02-13HouseRead third time
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-11HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106646D-H1
2019-02-11HouseReported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2019-02-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-29SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N)
2019-01-24SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16SenateAssigned Education sub: Higher Education
2019-01-05SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-01-05SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101243D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2311304(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1234
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1234+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1234H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1234ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0642+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0118+SB1234
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0196SB1234+SB1234
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0221SB1234+SB1234
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H09V0130+SB1234
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2683+SB1234
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0676SB1234+SB1234

Bill Comments

feedback