VA SB1246 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0584)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0584)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Presidential primary. Moves the presidential primary date from the second Tuesday in February to the first Tuesday in March. The bill retains the first Tuesday in March as the primary date before the May general election.
Title
Presidential primary; moves date to first Tuesday in March.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0584) | |
2011-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 584 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-18 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1246ER) | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-15 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-15 | House: Passed House (97-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-15 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-14 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-11 | House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-28 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 1-N) | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103622D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 515 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 544 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 545 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |