VA SB1255 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on February 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0001)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on February 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0001)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Major Headquarters Workforce Grant Fund. Creates the Major Headquarters Workforce Grant Fund. A qualified e-commerce company that makes a capital investment of at least $2 billion in a major headquarters facility in Arlington County and that creates at least 25,000 new full-time jobs with an average annual wage of $150,000 will be eligible for up to $550 million in grants from the Fund. A qualified company may also be eligible for an additional $200 million in grants for creating an additional 12,850 new full-time jobs. This bill is identical to HB 2356.
Title
Major Headquarters Workforce Grant Fund; created.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] | Sen. Richard Saslaw [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Sen. John Cosgrove [R] |
Sen. Rosalyn Dance [D] | Sen. Emmett Hanger [R] | Sen. Thomas Norment [R] | Sen. Frank Wagner [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 16-N) (Y: 83 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0001) | |
2019-02-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-01-30 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 6, 2019 | |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on January 30, 2019 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-01-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1255ER) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-01-28 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 16-N) |
2019-01-28 | House | Passed House (83-Y 16-N) |
2019-01-28 | House | Read third time |
2019-01-25 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-23 | House | Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 5-N) |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N 2-A) |
2019-01-05 | Senate | Introduced bill reprinted 19102500D |
2019-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102500D |