VA SB1267 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-06 - Incorporated by Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-06 - Incorporated by Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
State and Local Government Conflict of Interests Act and General Assembly Conflicts of Interests Act; prohibited conduct related to gifts and travel. Prohibits state and local government officers and employees and members of the General Assembly from accepting any gift or any combination of gifts with a value exceeding the current limit of $250 from a third party prior to submitting to the Virginia Conflict of Interest and Ethics Advisory Council a request for a waiver to accept such gift and receiving such a waiver. The bill requires the Council to receive and review requests for waivers, and, within seven days of receiving a request, approve or deny the request for waiver. In reviewing the request for a waiver, the Council shall consider the nature of the gift, the relationship between the requester and the third party providing the gift, and whether the gift relates to the official duties of the requester. When reviewing a request for a waiver for a travel-related gift, the Council is also required to consider the purpose of the travel as it relates to the official duties of the requester. Waivers are not required for travel paid for or provided by the government of the United States, any of its territories, or another state in the United States or the political subdivision of such other state. The bill also removes the distinction between tangible and intangible gifts and prohibits any single gift, or any combination of gifts in a calendar year, with a value exceeding $250 given from any third party to those persons subject to the Conflicts of Interests Acts. For purposes of the prohibition and the waiver exception, "third party" is defined as any person who the officer, employee, or legislator knows or has reason to know is a lobbyist registered pursuant to Article 3 (§ 2.2-418 et seq.) of Chapter 4 of Title 2.2 of the Code of Virginia; a lobbyist's principal as defined in § 2.2-419; a person, organization, or business who is a party to or is seeking to become a party to a contract with the Commonwealth or one of its political subdivisions; or a person whose interests may be substantially affected by the performance of the official duties of the officer, employee, or legislator.
Title
Conflicts of Interests Acts, State and Local Government, and General Assembly; prohibited.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-06 | Senate | Incorporated by Rules |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Assigned Rules sub: Ethics and Conflict of Interest |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101128D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1424 (Similar To) 2015-04-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0777)