VA SB1273 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0320)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0320)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Corrections; health care continuous quality improvement committee. Requires the Director of the Department of Corrections to establish a health care continuous quality improvement committee, consisting of the Director and specified health care professionals employed by the Department. The bill requires the committee to (i) identify appropriate criteria for evaluation of the quality of health care services provided by the Department, (ii) monitor and evaluate the quality of health care services provided by the Department utilizing the criteria identified, and (iii) develop strategies to improve the quality of health care services provided by the Department. The bill also requires the committee to publish quarterly continuous quality improvement reports setting forth such data and information as the committee deems appropriate on a website maintained by the Department. As introduced, this bill is a recommendation of the Joint Commission on Health Care. This bill is identical to HB 1917.
Title
DOC; Director to establish health care continuous quality improvement committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0320) | |
2019-03-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 320 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1273ER) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-13 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2019-02-11 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-11 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-07 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1273S1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19104821D-S1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19104821D-S1 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101420D |