VA SB1339 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0561)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0561)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Urban development areas; population projections. Allows population projections to be based on official government projections required for federal transportation planning purposes.
Title
Urban development areas; population projections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0561) | |
2011-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 561 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1339ER) | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-22 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-21 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-18 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-17 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #2 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-20 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-18 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102948D |