VA SB1339 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0446)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Foster care omnibus. Makes numerous changes to the laws governing the provision of foster care services in the Commonwealth. Among other things, the bill (i) allows the Commissioner of Social Services to develop and implement a corrective action plan for or assume temporary control over the foster care services of a local board of social services upon determining that the local board (a) has failed to provide foster care services or make placement and removal decisions in accordance with applicable laws or regulations or (b) has taken any action that poses a substantial risk to the health, safety, or well-being of any child under its supervision and control; (ii) requires the Commissioner to create within the State Department of Social Services (the Department) a foster care health and safety director position; (iii) directs the Commissioner to establish and maintain a confidential hotline to receive reports and complaints from foster parents and other persons regarding violations of laws or regulations applicable to foster care and any other matters related to the health, safety, or well-being of children in foster care; (iv) directs the Department to develop and implement a more reliable, structured, and comprehensive case review and quality improvement process to monitor and improve foster care services provided by local boards and departments of social services; and (v) requires the Department to establish and update annually a caseload standard that limits the number of foster care cases that may be assigned to each foster care caseworker.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Foster care; numerous changes to laws governing provision of services in the Commonwealth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0446)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 446 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1339ER)
2019-02-23SenateEnrolled
2019-02-21SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HousePassed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2019-02-20HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-20HouseRead third time
2019-02-19HouseRead second time
2019-02-18HouseReported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06HouseAssigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-01SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenatePrinted as engrossed 19102687D-E
2019-01-31SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1339E
2019-01-31SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-01-31SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-01-31SenateRead second time
2019-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29SenateReported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-01-18SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102687D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
632209(n/a)See Bill Text
632900(n/a)See Bill Text
632900.1(n/a)See Bill Text
632904(n/a)See Bill Text
632904.1(n/a)See Bill Text
632904.2(n/a)See Bill Text
632906(n/a)See Bill Text
632907(n/a)See Bill Text
632913.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1339
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1339+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1339E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1339ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0446+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S09V0016+SB1339
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0146+SB1339
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0248SB1339+SB1339
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0278SB1339+SB1339
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0197+SB1339
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3122+SB1339
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0933SB1339+SB1339

Bill Comments

feedback