VA SB1346 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-25 - Senate: Incorporated by Privileges and Elections (SB1213-Smith) (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-25 - Senate: Incorporated by Privileges and Elections (SB1213-Smith) (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; distribution of mail voter registration application forms. Provides that the State Board of Elections, in cooperation with the Department of Game and Inland Fisheries, will make mail voter registration application forms available where hunting and fishing licenses are sold.
Title
Elections; distribution of mail voter registration application forms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Privileges and Elections (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-25 | Senate: Incorporated by Privileges and Elections (SB1213-Smith) (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-14 | Senate: Assigned to P&E sub: Campaigns and Elections | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101481D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1501 (Same As) 2011-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0197)
SB1213 (Same As) 2011-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0225)
SB1213 (Same As) 2011-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0225)