VA SB1352 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0212)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0212)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Capital cases; replacing certain terminology. Replaces the term "mental retardation" in all of its various iterations with a corresponding iteration of the term "intellectual disability" for purposes of the statutes governing capital cases. The U.S. Supreme Court has held in Hall v. Florida, 134 S. Ct. 1986 (2014), that the terms describe the identical phenomenon. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia State Crime Commission. This bill is identical to HB 1882.
Title
Capital cases; replacing certain terminology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0212) | |
2017-02-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 212 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017 | |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/17/17 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1352ER) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-13 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-08 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103230D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 264.3:1.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 264.3:1.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 264.3:3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 654.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |