VA SB1354 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0583)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0583)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Uniformed services-connected students; identification. Requires the Department of Education to establish a process for the identification by local school divisions of newly enrolled students who have a parent in the uniformed services. Local school divisions are required to identify such students in accordance with the process. Nonidentifiable, aggregate data collected from the identification of such students shall be made available to local, state, and federal entities for the purposes of becoming eligible for nongeneral fund sources and receiving services to meet the needs of uniformed services-connected students residing in the Commonwealth.
Title
Uniformed services-connected students; identification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 35-N) (Y: 3 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 35-N) (Y: 3 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0583) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 583 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1354ER) |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-26 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-26 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 15105599D-S2 |
2015-02-26 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2015-02-25 | House | Delegates: Ramadan, Greason, Mason |
2015-02-25 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senators: Reeves, Cosgrove, Dance |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | House | House requested conference committee |
2015-02-23 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2015-02-20 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 35-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1354H1 |
2015-02-18 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15105037D-H1 |
2015-02-18 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-17 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-16 | House | Committee substitute printed 15105037D-H1 |
2015-02-16 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1354S1 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104857D-S1 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Incorporates SB1347 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104857D-S1 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 15103164D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1347 (Similar To) 2015-02-05 - Incorporated by Education and Health
HB2373 (Same As) 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0582)
HB2373 (Same As) 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0582)