VA HB2373 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0582)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0582)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Uniformed services-connected students; identification. Requires the Department of Education to establish a process for the identification by local school divisions of newly enrolled students who have a parent in the uniformed services. Local school divisions are required to identify such students in accordance with the process. Nonidentifiable, aggregate data collected from the identification of such students shall be made available to local, state, and federal entities for the purposes of becoming eligible for nongeneral fund sources and receiving services to meet the needs of uniformed services-connected students residing in the Commonwealth.
Title
Uniformed services-connected students; Department of Education shall establish process to identify.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 99-N) (Y: 1 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 99-N) (Y: 1 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0582) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 582 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2373ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-26 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-26 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-26 | House | Conference substitute printed 15105601D-H1 |
2015-02-26 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senators: Reeves, Cosgrove, Dance |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2015-02-26 | House | Delegates: Ramadan, Greason, Mason |
2015-02-26 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2015-02-26 | House | House acceded to request |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 99-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 15105311D-S1 (1-Y 99-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2373S1 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15105311D-S1 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15105311D-S1 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-09 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Read third time and passed House (96-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Printed as engrossed 15103903D-E |
2015-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2373E |
2015-02-06 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-04 | House | Reported from Education with amendment (21-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 2-N) |
2015-01-29 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2015-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-01-23 | House | Presented and ordered printed 15103903D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1354 (Same As) 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0583)