VA SB1409 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - Senate: Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - Senate: Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Sex offender registry. Requires registration when a person 18 years of age or older is convicted of engaging in consensual sexual intercourse with a child 15 years of age or older. Registration will also be required for someone convicted of the federal crime of video voyeurism. Portions of the crimes against nature statute are moved from the regular registry to become classified as sexually violent offenses. Juveniles over the age of 13 adjudicated delinquent of a registerable offense on or after July 1, 2005, must register; however, their information is not required to be published on the Internet. Under current law the court has discretion in requiring registration for such juveniles. Passport and immigration information is added to the registration information that an offender must provide. Photographs will be taken at the time of physical verification by the authorities rather than every two years.
Title
Sex offender registry; if person 18 must register if convicted of consensual sex with 15 year old.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | Senate: Left in Finance | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11104744D-S1 | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-19 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2011-01-18 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-18 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 11102306D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 361 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 903 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 904 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 913 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |