VA SB1415 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0631)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0631)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Opioid impact reduction. Allows any person to possess and administer naloxone or other opioid antagonist used for overdose reversal other than naloxone in an injectable formulation with a hypodermic needle or syringe in accordance with protocols developed by the Board of Pharmacy in consultation with the Board of Medicine and the Department of Health, provided that certain other conditions enumerated in current law are met. The bill removes training requirements related to the possession and administration of naloxone. The bill directs the Department of Health, the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, and the Department of Corrections to collaborate to develop a statewide comprehensive plan for the distribution of naloxone throughout the Commonwealth and allows such agencies to begin implementation of the plan to the extent the agencies are able to do so with existing resources. The bill requires the Department of Health to provide a report on the development of the comprehensive statewide naloxone plan, including the resources needed to fully implement the plan, to the Chairs of the House Committee on Appropriations and the Senate Committee on Finance and Appropriations by September 1, 2023. The bill directs the Department of Health to begin the development of a Commonwealth opioid impact reduction registry consisting of nonprofit organizations that work to reduce the impact of opioids in the Commonwealth and directs the Department of Corrections to amend its regulations to require that training in the administration of naloxone be provided to every inmate prior to release. Opioid impact reduction. Allows any person to possess and administer naloxone or other opioid antagonist used for overdose reversal other than naloxone in an injectable formulation with a hypodermic needle or syringe in accordance with protocols developed by the Board of Pharmacy in consultation with the Board of Medicine and the Department of Health, provided that certain other conditions enumerated in current law are met. The bill removes training requirements related to the possession and administration of naloxone. The bill directs the Department of Health, the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services, and the Department of Corrections to collaborate to develop a statewide comprehensive plan for the distribution of naloxone throughout the Commonwealth and allows such agencies to begin implementation of the plan to the extent the agencies are able to do so with existing resources. The bill requires the Department of Health to provide a report on the development of the comprehensive statewide naloxone plan, including the resources needed to fully implement the plan, to the Chairs of the House Committee on Appropriations and the Senate Committee on Finance and Appropriations by September 1, 2023. The bill directs the Department of Health to begin the development of a Commonwealth opioid impact reduction registry consisting of nonprofit organizations that work to reduce the impact of opioids in the Commonwealth and directs the Department of Corrections to amend its regulations to require that training in the administration of naloxone be provided to every inmate prior to release.
Title
Opioids; impact reduction registry, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0631) | |
2023-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 631 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1415ER) |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-20 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-20 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-17 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-15 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-02-14 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-13 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2023-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2023-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1415S1 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 23105909D-S1 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Education and Health Committee amendments rejected |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23105909D-S1 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101946D |