VA SB1445 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0422)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0422)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appraisal management companies; compensation of appraisers. Provides for an appraisal management company to compensate appraisers in compliance with § 129E(i) of the federal Truth in Lending Act (15 U.S.C. § 1601 et seq.).
Title
Appraisal management companies; appraiser compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0422) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 422 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/26/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1445ER) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-19 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2015-02-19 | House | Passed House (98-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2015-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-17 | House | Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-13 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2015-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1445S1 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104884D-S1 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (10-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104884D-S1 |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 15103447D |