VA SB148 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0616)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0616)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Methamphetamine lab cleanup costs; reimbursement of localities. Allows localities to provide by ordinance that any person who is convicted of an offense for manufacture of methamphetamine shall be liable to the locality or other law-enforcement entity for the expense in cleaning up any methamphetamine lab related to the conviction.
Title
Methamphetamine lab cleanup costs; localities may charge for reimbursement .
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (35-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0616) | |
2012-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 616 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-09 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-09 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB148ER) | |
2012-03-09 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Title replaced 12106034D-H1 | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (35-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-08 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-08 | House: Passed House with substitute (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-08 | House: Engrossed by House - floor substitute SB148H1 | |
2012-03-08 | House: Substitute by Delegate Johnson agreed to 12106034D-H1 | |
2012-03-08 | House: Floor substitute printed 12106034D-H1 (Johnson) | |
2012-03-08 | House: Committee amendments rejected | |
2012-03-08 | House: Read third time | |
2012-03-07 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2012-03-07 | House: Read third time | |
2012-03-06 | House: Read second time | |
2012-03-02 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (18-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-29 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-28 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2012-02-24 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-24 | House: Referred from Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote | |
2012-02-20 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #1 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-03 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB148S1 | |
2012-02-03 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12104452D-S1 | |
2012-02-03 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-02-03 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12104452D-S1 | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101862D |
Same As/Similar To
HB848 (Same As) 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0517)