VA SB1495 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0646)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Rural Information Technology Apprenticeship Grant Fund and Program. Establishes the Virginia Rural Information Technology Apprenticeship Grant Fund and Program, to be administered by the Southwest Virginia Higher Education Center, for the purpose of awarding grants to small, rural information technology businesses in certain localities in the Southwest and Southside regions of Virginia to establish 18-month apprenticeship programs for full-time employees that combine mentorship and on-the-job training to enhance the experience and skills of such employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Rural Information Technology Apprenticeship Grant Fund and Program; established.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0646)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 646 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1495ER)
2019-02-23SenateEnrolled
2019-02-21HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
2019-02-21HouseConference report agreed to by House (98-Y 1-N)
2019-02-20SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-19HouseDelegates: Kilgore, Landes, Hayes
2019-02-19HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-18SenateSenators: Chafin, Suetterlein, Barker
2019-02-18SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-18SenateSenate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14HouseHouse requested conference committee
2019-02-14HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2019-02-13SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N)
2019-02-11HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1495H1
2019-02-11HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106510D-H1
2019-02-11HouseRead third time
2019-02-08HouseRead second time
2019-02-06HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106510D-H1
2019-02-06HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseAssigned App. sub: Higher Education
2019-01-30HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-30HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-28SenateRead third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25SenatePrinted as engrossed 19103246D-E
2019-01-25SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1495E
2019-01-25SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-01-25SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-01-25SenateRead second time
2019-01-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23SenateReported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-01-17SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103246D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2313129.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1495
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1495+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1495E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1495H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1495ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0646+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0068+SB1495
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0104+SB1495
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0172SB1495+SB1495
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0201SB1495+SB1495
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0169+SB1495
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2629+SB1495
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0575SB1495+SB1495
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0742SB1495+SB1495
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0918SB1495+SB1495
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3239+SB1495

Bill Comments

feedback