VA SB1501 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0672)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0672)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Victim's right to notification of scientific analysis information. Provides that for any physical evidence recovery kit that was received by a law-enforcement agency prior to July 1, 2016, and submitted for analysis, the victim, a parent or guardian of a minor victim, or the next of kin of a deceased victim shall be notified of the completion of the analysis and shall, upon request, receive information regarding the results of any analysis from the law-enforcement agency. The bill provides that law enforcement shall not be required to disclose the results of any analysis to an alleged perpetrator. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Physical evidence recovery kit; victim's right to notification of scientific analysis information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0672) | |
2017-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 672 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1501ER) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-23 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | Passed House with amendment (100-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-22 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2017-02-22 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-22 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (10-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 17103992D-E |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1501E |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 17103992D |