VA SB1509 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0610)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Disposition of property in Carroll County; Southwestern Virginia Training Center. Provides that the Commonwealth shall work with representatives of Carroll and Grayson Counties and the City of Galax, as well as other stakeholders, to develop a plan for the conveyance, sale, or other disposition of certain real property for the purpose of housing children requiring foster care or as a juvenile residential treatment facility. Any disposition of the property is subject to approval by the General Assembly; however, the restriction on disposition of the property expires on July 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Southwestern Virginia Training Center; disposition of certain real property in Carroll County.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0610)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 610 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-27 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-27SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019
2019-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-20SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1509ER)
2019-02-20SenateEnrolled
2019-02-15SenateTitle replaced 19106713D-H1
2019-02-15SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HousePassed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB1509H1
2019-02-13HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106713D-H1
2019-02-13HouseRead third time
2019-02-12HouseRead second time
2019-02-11HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106713D-H1
2019-02-11HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-06HouseRead first time
2019-02-06HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-01SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1509S1
2019-01-31SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106008D-S1
2019-01-31SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-01-31SenateRead second time
2019-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29SenateReported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106008D-S1
2019-01-23SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-01-23SenateReported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101911D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1509
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1509+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1509S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1509H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1509ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0610+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0133+SB1509
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0147+SB1509
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0248SB1509+SB1509
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0278SB1509+SB1509
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0191+SB1509
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2719+SB1509
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0686SB1509+SB1509

Bill Comments

feedback