VA SB1527 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Charitable Gaming Board; conduct of charitable gaming. Requires the Virginia Charitable Gaming Board to conduct an annual evaluation of the conduct of charitable gaming operations in Virginia. The bill also removes restrictions regarding the number of calendar days that charitable gaming may be conducted at buildings owned by nonprofit entities and raises from two to four the number of days that such gaming may be conducted in buildings owned by other entities. The bill also (i) removes the limit of 55 bingo games per session, (ii) increases the number of electronic pull tabs that may be placed in the social quarters of a qualified organization from nine, as currently provided by Board regulations, to 50, and (iii) authorizes a qualified organization to pay individuals assisting in the conduct of charitable gaming up to $50 per session.
Title
Virginia Charitable Gaming Board; conduct of charitable gaming.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in General Laws |
2019-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred from Rules by voice vote |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 19101744D-E |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1527E |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (14-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101744D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 340.19 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.27 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.33 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2456 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |