VA SB153 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Stricken at request of patron in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Stricken at request of patron in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Medical Ethics Defense Act established. Establishes the right of a medical practitioner, health care institution, or health care payer not to participate in or pay for any medical procedure or service that violates such medical practitioner's, health care institution's, or health care payer's conscience, as those terms and conditions are defined in the bill. The bill provides protections for medical practitioners who disclose violations of the bill or report violations of laws or ethical guidelines for the safe provision of any medical procedure or service. The bill also provides a private right of action for any party harmed by violations of the bill.
Title
Medical Ethics Defense Act; established.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Head [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Stricken at request of patron in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | Senate | Stricken at request of patron in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned Education and Health Sub: Health |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104587D |
Same As/Similar To
HB8 (Similar To) 2024-02-13 - Left in Health and Human Services