VA SB1539 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-24 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Withholding of income for child support; independent contractors. Clarifies that income earned by an independent contractor may be withheld by court order for payment of child support obligations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child support; withholding of income of independent contractors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (51-Y 49-N) (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 8-N) (Y: 9 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-24HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2019-02-21HouseRereferred to Courts of Justice
2019-02-21HouseVOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (51-Y 49-N)
2019-02-21HouseMotion to rerefer to committee agreed to (51-Y 49-N)
2019-02-20HousePassed by for the day
2019-02-19HouseRead second time
2019-02-18HouseReported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 8-N)
2019-02-13HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N)
2019-02-12HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-02-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-08HouseRead first time
2019-02-08HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-05SenatePassed Senate (32-Y 7-N)
2019-02-05SenatePassed by temporarily
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 1-N)
2019-02-05SenatePrinted as engrossed 19100092D-E
2019-02-05SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1539E
2019-02-05SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-05SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-02-05SenateEngrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
2019-02-04SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (10-Y 3-N)
2019-01-25SenateRereferred to General Laws and Technology
2019-01-25SenateMotion to rerefer to committee agreed to
2019-01-24SenatePassed by for the day
2019-01-23SenateRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21SenateReported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 1-N)
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100092D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
161278.16(n/a)See Bill Text
6321900(n/a)See Bill Text
6321903(n/a)See Bill Text
6321929(n/a)See Bill Text
6321944(n/a)See Bill Text
6321946(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1539
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1539+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1539E+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0100+SB1539
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0134SB1539+SB1539
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0103+SB1539
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0394SB1539+SB1539
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0395SB1539+SB1539
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0411SB1539+SB1539
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0802V0087+SB1539
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0368+SB1539
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3190+SB1539

Bill Comments

feedback