VA SB1559 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0665)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0665)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Board of zoning appeals. Requires that the recipient of certain notices from the board of zoning appeals receive notice via registered mail to the last known address or usual place of abode of the property owner or its registered agent, if any, prior to the commencement of the 30-day appeal period.
Title
Zoning appeals, board of; recipient to receive notice of zoning violation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0665) | |
2017-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 665 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1559ER) |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-21 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2017-02-21 | House | Passed House (93-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2017-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2017-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 17104090D-E |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1559E |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Local Government with amendments (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 17104090D |