VA SB1595 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Education; individualized education program teams; guidelines. Requires the Department of Education to establish guidelines for individualized education program (IEP) teams to utilize when developing IEPs for children with disabilities to ensure that IEP teams consider the need for age-appropriate and developmentally-appropriate instruction related to sexual health, self-restraint, self-protection, respect for personal privacy, and personal boundaries of others. The bill requires each local school board, in developing IEPs for children with disabilities, in addition to any other requirements established by the Board, to ensure that IEP teams consider such guidelines.
Title
Individualized education programs (IEPs); DOE shall establish guidelines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Education (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Education |
2019-02-18 | House | Rereferred to Education |
2019-02-18 | House | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-13 | House | Reported from Education (12-Y 10-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1595S1 |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105059D-S1 |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105059D-S1 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102691D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 207.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 207.1:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |