VA SB1725 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Stationary blinds in the public waters; minimum distance from shore. Provides that no stake or stationary waterfowl blind that is erected in the public waters, except in the waters of Virginia Beach, shall be located less than 150 yards from a riparian owner's shoreline at the mean low water mark, unless the riparian owner gives written permission to locate the stake or blind closer to shore.
Title
Stationary blinds in the public waters; waters of Virginia Beach, minimum distance from shore.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-04 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1725S1 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Reeves ruled out of order |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19105391D-S1 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 19106007D-S2 (Reeves) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19105391D-S1 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 19103536D |