VA SB1766 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Stricken at request of patron in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Stricken at request of patron in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Pharmacy; two-year pilot; controlled substance tracking system. Directs the Board of Pharmacy (Board) to conduct a two-year pilot program beginning September 1, 2019, for the development, management, use, and evaluation of a controlled substance tracking system using dispenser data compliant with the federal Drug Supply Chain Security Act. The bill requires each pharmacy permitted in the Commonwealth to participate in the program and to collect and report certain data to the Board. The Board is required to provide access to the reported information to state and federal law-enforcement agencies having jurisdiction over prescription drug law enforcement. The bill authorizes the Board to enter into agreements with the Department of Health and the Department of State Police to implement the program and requires a final report by October 31, 2021, to the Governor's Advisory Commission on Opioids and Addiction and to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions and the Senate Committee on Education and Health. Finally, the bill requires the Board to promulgate regulations to implement the provisions of the program to be effective no later than September 1, 2019.
Title
Controlled substance tracking system; Board of Pharmacy to conduct a two-year pilot program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Stricken at request of patron in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Senate | Stricken at request of patron in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 19104565D |