VA SB1771 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0406)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0406)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State share for basic aid; duration of certain agreements. Provides that certain cost-savings agreements between school divisions will remain in effect until terminated by the school divisions. Under current law, such agreements are valid for a period of 15 years. This bill is identical to HB 1807.
Title
State share for basic aid; duration of certain agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0406) | |
2019-03-14 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 406 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House reprinted (SB1771ER) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1771ER) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2019-02-20 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed House (97-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-20 | House | Committee substitute rejected 19107111D-H1 |
2019-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2019-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-18 | House | Committee substitute printed 19107111D-H1 |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Presented and ordered printed 19100984D |