VA SB18 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0442)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0442)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Unemployment compensation; quit to follow military spouse. Provides that good cause for leaving employment exists if an employee voluntarily leaves a job to accompany the employee's spouse, who is on active duty in the military or naval services of the United States, to a new military-related assignment established pursuant to a permanent change of duty order from which the employee's place of employment is not reasonably accessible. The measure applies only if the state to which the spouse is transferred has a similar provision, unless the transfer involves members of the Virginia National Guard relocated within the Commonwealth. Benefits paid to qualifying claimants shall be charged against the pool rather than against the claimant's employer. The measure also repeals Chapter 878 of the 2009 Acts of Assembly, which is similar to this measure but did not take effect because the contingency in its third enactment was not satisfied. The measure will expire on December 31, 2020. The Virginia Employment Commission is required to report to the Commission on Unemployment Compensation regarding the effects of allowing such claimants to be eligible for unemployment benefits.
Title
Unemployment compensation; voluntarily leaving employment to accompany military spouse.
Sponsors
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] | Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 2-N) (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 2-N) (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0442) | |
2014-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 442 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB18ER) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-03-04 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-03 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 2-N) |
2014-03-03 | House | Passed House with amendment (91-Y 2-N) |
2014-03-03 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2014-03-03 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-03-03 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-25 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 14101454D-E |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB18E |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2013-12-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2013-12-05 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101454D |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Labor and Employment
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Unemployment Compensation
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Labor and Employment
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Unemployment Compensation