VA SB195 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0812)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0812)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local towing ordinances. Allows localities in Northern Virginia by ordinance to require towing companies that tow trespassing vehicles within 10 miles of the tow origin from one locality to another to submit to inspection of their facilities by the locality from which such vehicles are towed.
Title
Towing ordinances; localities in Northern Virginia to require companies to submit to inspection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0812) | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 812 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-04-18 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB195ER2) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-17 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-04-09 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2012-03-07 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-05 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB195ER) | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | House: Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2012-02-27 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2012-02-27 | House: Read third time | |
2012-02-24 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-23 | House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-22 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-17 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #2 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 12100020D-E | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB195E | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-01-27 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-01-10 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100020D |
Same As/Similar To
HB860 (Same As) 2012-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0149)