VA HB860 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0149)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0149)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local towing ordinances. Allows localities in Northern Virginia by ordinance to regulate the towing of trespassing vehicles from the locality adopting the ordinance to another locality.
Title
Towing ordinances; localities in Northern Virginia to require companies to submit to inspection.
Sponsors
Del. Thomas Rust [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0149) | |
2012-03-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 149 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-23 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-23 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB860ER) | |
2012-02-23 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-07 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-07 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-06 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB860H1 | |
2012-02-06 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12104995D-H1 | |
2012-02-06 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-03 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-02 | House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-02 | House: Committee substitute printed 12104995D-H1 | |
2012-01-31 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-20 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #1 | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100021D |
Same As/Similar To
SB195 (Same As) 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0812)