VA SB196 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0597)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0597)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Notification of school nonattendance. Clarifies that, in addition to the attendance officer, school personnel, and volunteers, the school principal or his designee is responsible for notifying parents concerning students' nonattendance at school. This bill also provides that the school principal or his designee is also responsible for arranging the conference with parents and in developing the student's attendance plan.
Title
School nonattendance; attendance officer, volunteers, school personnel, & principal notifies parent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0597) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 597 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-12 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB196ER) | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-05 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-05 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-05 | House: Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House | |
2010-03-05 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-05 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-05 | House: Read third time | |
2010-03-04 | House: Read second time | |
2010-03-03 | House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Assigned Education sub: #2 Students and Daycare | |
2010-02-03 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2010-02-03 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-03 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-01-26 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-01-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-21 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102776D |