VA SB244 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0691)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0691)
Summary
Magistrates. Reforms the magistrate system by transferring appointment and supervisory responsibilities from the circuit court judges to the Executive Secretary of the Supreme Court, although the chief judges of the circuit courts in the region are to be consulted regarding appointments. Magistrates initially appointed on or after July 1, 2008, must have a bachelor's degree from an accredited college and persons appointed chief magistrates on or after July 1, 2008, are required to be members in good standing of the Virginia State Bar. No magistrate appointed on or after July 1, 2008, may practice law. No magistrate may engage in any other business without the approval of the Executive Secretary. Magistrates will have to serve an initial nine-month probationary period (currently, six months), complete a minimum training program and pass a certification exam. The bill broadens magistrates' geographical assignment from within a particular judicial district to regions established by the Executive Secretary. The bill makes technical amendments replacing "justice of the peace" with "magistrate" and removes references to magistrates serving only within a particular jurisdiction or district. This bill is identical to
Title
Magistrates; reforms system by transferring appointment and supervisory responsibilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0691) | |
2008-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 691 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB244ER) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (37-Y 3-N) | |
2008-03-03 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (87-Y 13-N) | |
2008-03-03 | House: Passed House with amendment (87-Y 13-N) | |
2008-03-03 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2008-03-03 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-03-03 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-29 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-27 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (11-Y 8-N) | |
2008-02-14 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 11-N 1-A) | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 081724866-E | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB244E | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 1-N 1-A) | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 1-N) | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081724866 |
Same As/Similar To
HB903 (Same As) 2008-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0551)
Subjects
Agriculture, Horticulture and Food
Criminal Procedure
Fire Protection
Mental Health, Mental Retardation, and Substance Abuse Services
Criminal Procedure
Fire Protection
Mental Health, Mental Retardation, and Substance Abuse Services
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB244 |