VA SB282 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0793)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0793)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Landlord and Tenant; eviction procedure; acceptance of redemption tenders. Provides that when a tenant presents on or before the first return date on an action for unlawful detainer for the nonpayment of rent, a redemption tender in the amount of all current rent, reasonable late charges, attorney fees, and court costs, the court shall continue the action for 10 days.
Title
Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; eviction procedure, acceptance of redemption tenders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (96-Y 4-N) (Y: 98 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (96-Y 4-N) (Y: 98 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0793) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Enacted, Chapter 793 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB282ER2) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2010-04-21 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 1-N) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-20 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-04-13 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2010-03-15 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-13 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB282ER) | |
2010-03-12 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-04 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (96-Y 4-N) | |
2010-03-04 | House: Passed House with amendment (96-Y 4-N) | |
2010-03-04 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2010-03-04 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-03-04 | House: Read third time | |
2010-03-03 | House: Read second time | |
2010-03-02 | House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 1-N) | |
2010-02-24 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-23 | House: Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing | |
2010-02-08 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2010-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-08 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-02 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 10103397D-E | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB282E | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-01-29 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-27 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103397D |