VA SB294 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0646)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0646)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Administrative Process Act; exemption for certain regulations of the Department of Veterans Services. Provides an exemption from the Administrative Process Act for the Department of Veterans Services when promulgating rules and regulations pertaining to the real property tax exemption for surviving spouses of members of the armed forces killed in action.
Title
Administrative Process Act; exemption for certain regulations of Dept. of Veterans Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0646) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 646 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-16 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 16, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB294ER) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-06 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Read third time |
2018-03-05 | House | Read second time |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2018-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101548D |