VA SB298 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0451)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0451)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Funding of Department of Rail and Public Transportation. Codifies appropriation act language dealing with funding of the Department of Rail and Public Transportation.
Title
Rail and Public Transportation, Department of; funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0451) | |
2014-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 451 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB298ER) |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-27 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-27 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-27 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-26 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-24 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-19 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101414D |
Same As/Similar To
HB396 (Same As) 2014-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0066)