VA SB316 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Telecommunications relay service; funding. Defines "end-user equipment" as any communications device that enables or assists a person with a disability to communicate through the public-switched telephone network or internet protocol-enabled communications service, and changes the funding source for funds to cover costs associated with the purchase and distribution of end-user equipment from general to nongeneral (communications sales and use tax revenue) funds. The provisions of this act shall expire on July 1, 2012.
Title
Telecommunications relay service; defines end-user equipment, sunset provision.
Sponsors
Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-14 | House: Left in General Laws | |
2010-03-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | House: Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process | |
2010-02-17 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2010-02-17 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 10101302D-E | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB316E | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101302D |