VA SB317 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0729)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0729)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Roanoke River Basin Advisory Committee. Removes the cap on reappointments for nonlegislative citizen members of the Roanoke River Basin Advisory Committee. Currently, nonlegislative citizen members may only serve three consecutive two-year terms.
Title
Roanoke River Basin Advisory Committee; removes cap on reappointments for nonlegislative citizens.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0729) | |
2010-04-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 729 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-05 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB317ER) | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-02-26 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | House: Read third time | |
2010-02-25 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-24 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-17 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2010-02-17 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Assigned Rules sub: #1 | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100980D |