VA SB329 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-14 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Court fees. Increases the court fees in both district and circuit court from (i) $27 to $75 in a district court civil action and (ii) the current scale of $60-$160 to $500-$1,000 in civil actions in circuit court. The fee increases under this bill in district court are allocated to the sheriffs' departments, and the increases in circuit court are split between the sheriffs' (85%) and the commonwealth attorneys' (15%) offices to be used exclusively for achieving the current staffing standards of the two constitutional offices. The $10 fee for the Courts Technology Fund is removed from civil cases. The Fund still receives fees applicable to other filings in the circuit and appellate courts.
Title
District and circuit courts; increases court fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-14 | House: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2010-02-18 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-02-18 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-18 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB329S3 | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Amendment by Senator Norment withdrawn | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Substitute by Senator Stuart agreed to 10105332D-S3 | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Committee substitute rejected 10105296D-S2 | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Committee substitute rejected 10105144D-S1 | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Motion to pass by for the day withdrawn | |
2010-02-15 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Floor substitute printed 10105332D-S3 (Stuart) | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2010-02-12 | Senate: Read second time | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10105296D-S2 | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 2-N) | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10105144D-S1 | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 4-N) | |
2010-01-14 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103517D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 69.48:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 132 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 275 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |