VA SB347 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-03 - House: Left in General Laws
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-03 - House: Left in General Laws
Summary
Smoking ban in restaurants; local option. Provides that any locality within Planning District 23 may adopt an ordinance regulating smoking in restaurants.
Title
Smoking; prohibited in restaurants in Planning District 23.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-03 | House: Left in General Laws | |
2008-02-12 | House: Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming | |
2008-02-12 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-12 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 10-N 1-A) | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB347S1 | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 082042204-S1 | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-01 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 082042204-S1 | |
2008-01-31 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (12-Y 3-N) | |
2008-01-18 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Public Smoking Legislation | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2008-01-08 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084566472 |
Subjects
Counties, Cities and Towns
Hotels, Restaurants, Summer Camps, and Campgrounds
Tobacco and Tobacco Products
Hotels, Restaurants, Summer Camps, and Campgrounds
Tobacco and Tobacco Products
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB347 |