VA SB37 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Sage's Law; minor students experiencing gender incongruence; parental notification of certain expressions and requests and parental permission for certain plans required; parental care. Requires each public elementary or secondary school principal or his designee to (i) as soon as practicable, inform at least one parent of a minor student enrolled in such school if such minor (a) expresses to any individual who is employed in such school that such minor is experiencing gender incongruence, as defined in the bill, or (b) requests that any such employee participate in social affirmation of such minor's gender incongruence or the transition of such minor to a sex or gender different from the minor's biological sex while at school and (ii) request and receive permission from at least one parent of a minor student enrolled at such school prior to the implementation at such school of any plan concerning any gender incongruence experienced by such minor, including any counseling of such minor at school. Any such plan shall include provision for parental participation to the extent requested by the parent. The bill also clarifies, in the definition of the term "abused or neglected child," that in no event shall referring to and raising the child in a manner consistent with the child's biological sex, including related mental health or medical decisions, be considered abuse or neglect.
Title
Sage's Law; minor students experiencing gender incongruence, parental notification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Assigned Education and Health Sub: Public Education |
2023-12-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2023-12-16 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101444D |
Same As/Similar To
HB670 (Similar To) 2024-02-13 - Left in Education