VA SB371 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0462)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0462)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Improvements to Route 711. Provides that Buchanan County may enter into an agreement with Pike County, Kentucky, to improve Route 711.
Title
Route 711; Buchanan County may enter into an agreement with Pike County, Kentucky to improve.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0462) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 462 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-05 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB371ER) | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-02-26 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | House: Read third time | |
2010-02-25 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-23 | House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-02 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-19 | Senate: Rereferred to Local Government | |
2010-01-19 | Senate: Rereferred from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2010-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102472D |
Same As/Similar To
HB848 (Same As) 2010-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0201)