VA SB375 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Immunity of persons; statements regarding matters of public concern or made at a public hearing; special plea to dismiss; stay of discovery. Provides that a person claiming immunity from certain claims for making statements at a public hearing or regarding matters of public concern may file a special plea to dismiss the underlying claim. The bill further provides that, upon the filing of such a plea, discovery related to such underlying claim shall be stayed pending the entry of an order adjudicating the plea.
Title
Immunity of persons; statements regarding matters of public concern or made at a public hearing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 38-N 1-A) (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 38-N 1-A) (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Failed to pass in Senate |
2020-03-12 | Senate | No further action taken |
2020-03-05 | House | Delegates: Mullin, Scott, Kilgore |
2020-03-05 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senators: Edwards, Petersen, Chafin |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | House requested conference committee |
2020-03-05 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2020-03-05 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | VOTE: Passage (58-Y 38-N 1-A) |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed House with substitute (58-Y 38-N 1-A) |
2020-03-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB375H1 |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20108556D-H1 |
2020-03-04 | House | Read third time |
2020-03-03 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 20108556D-H1 |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 7-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB375S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20107641D-S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20107641D-S1 |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Assigned Judiciary sub: Civil Law |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Moved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102358D |