VA SB39 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Stricken from Senate calendar (38-Y 2-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Stricken from Senate calendar (38-Y 2-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Unlawful transport of alcoholic beverages; penalty. Makes it a Class 1 misdemeanor for any person to whom an alcoholic beverage may not lawfully be sold (persons who are under age 21, interdicted, or intoxicated) to knowingly transport alcoholic beverages. Under current law the purchase, possession, or consumption of alcohol by such persons is a Class 1 misdemeanor.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; unlawful transport by persons who are under age 21, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Stricken from Senate calendar (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (4-Y 36-N) (Y: 4 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 4-N) (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (4-Y 36-N) (Y: 4 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 4-N) (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | Stricken from Senate calendar (38-Y 2-N) |
2016-03-09 | House | House requested conference committee |
2016-03-09 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2016-03-08 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (4-Y 36-N) |
2016-03-04 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 4-N) |
2016-03-04 | House | Passed House with substitute (92-Y 4-N) |
2016-03-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB39H1 |
2016-03-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16105990D-H1 |
2016-03-04 | House | Read third time |
2016-03-03 | House | Read second time |
2016-03-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 16105990D-H1 |
2016-03-01 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 1-N) |
2016-02-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2016-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 16100620D-E |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB39E |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-12-15 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2015-12-15 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100620D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 278.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 251.03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |