VA SB440 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Guaranteed Assistance Program; eligibility; use of funds. Makes several changes to the student eligibility criteria for Virginia Guaranteed Assistance Program grants, including (i) removing the requirement that the recipient be a dependent, (ii) requiring the recipient to be enrolled full time, (iii) removing the restriction on the number of years for which the grant may be renewed annually, and (iv) permitting renewal of the grant only if the recipient successfully completes a minimum of 30 credit hours in the immediate preceding award year, unless granted an exception for cause pursuant to State Council of Higher Education for Virginia regulations. The bill permits public institutions of higher education to use Guaranteed Assistance Program funds to provide enhanced awards to students who are enrolled in at least 15 credit hours per term. The provisions of the bill become effective beginning with first-time entering freshman class of the fall 2017 academic year.
Title
Virginia Guaranteed Assistance Program; eligibility; use of funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Failed to pass in Senate |
2016-03-11 | Senate | No further action taken |
2016-03-10 | House | Delegates: Cox, Greason, Torian |
2016-03-10 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Senators: Saslaw, Dunnavant, Carrico |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-08 | House | House requested conference committee |
2016-03-08 | House | House insisted on substitute |
2016-03-07 | Senate | House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) |
2016-03-03 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 2-N) |
2016-03-03 | House | Passed House with substitute (95-Y 2-N) |
2016-03-03 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB440H1 |
2016-03-03 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16105859D-H1 |
2016-03-03 | House | Read third time |
2016-03-02 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-29 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2016-02-29 | House | Committee substitute printed 16105859D-H1 |
2016-02-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | House | Assigned App. sub: Higher Education |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-02-17 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103159D |