VA SB444 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
School boards; placement in alternative education programs; disclosure of certain information in delinquency cases. Authorizes a court in which a disposition is entered or deferred in any proceeding where a student is charged with an offense that, pursuant to relevant law, is required to be disclosed to the superintendent of the school division in which the student is enrolled to, upon written request of any such division superintendent, provide a copy of the court order ordering any conditions upon such disposition or deferred disposition to such superintendent. The bill also provides that the division superintendent may, for any student charged with such offense and who is required to attend an alternative education program, request from the court, upon a showing of good cause, additional information that may be relevant to such student's placement in an alternative education program, including conditions that may have not been specified in the court order. School boards; placement in alternative education programs; disclosure of certain information in delinquency cases. Authorizes a court in which a disposition is entered or deferred in any proceeding where a student is charged with an offense that, pursuant to relevant law, is required to be disclosed to the superintendent of the school division in which the student is enrolled to, upon written request of any such division superintendent, provide a copy of the court order ordering any conditions upon such disposition or deferred disposition to such superintendent. The bill also provides that the division superintendent may, for any student charged with such offense and who is required to attend an alternative education program, request from the court, upon a showing of good cause, additional information that may be relevant to such student's placement in an alternative education program, including conditions that may have not been specified in the court order.
Title
School boards; placement in alternative education programs, disclosure of certain information.
Sponsors
Sen. Tara Durant [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (50-Y 48-N) (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Education (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Education (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | House | Left in Education |
2024-03-05 | House | VOTE: Adoption (50-Y 48-N) |
2024-03-05 | House | Rereferred to Education (50-Y 48-N) |
2024-03-05 | House | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to |
2024-03-04 | House | Passed by for the day |
2024-03-01 | House | Floor substitute printed 24108709D-H1 (Rasoul) |
2024-03-01 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-28 | House | Reported from Education (16-Y 6-N) |
2024-02-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2025 by voice vote |
2024-02-23 | House | Assigned Education sub: K-12 Subcommittee |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2024-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB444S1 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24106613D-S1 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24106613D-S1 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103962D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1385 (Similar To) 2024-02-07 - Continued to 2025 in Education by voice vote
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 305.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 277.2:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |