VA SB478 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0713)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0713)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Eminent domain; reimbursement of costs. Provides that costs and fees may be awarded in compensation actions initiated by public service companies, public service corporations, railroads that have been delegated the power of eminent domain, or government utility corporations where the amount that the owner is awarded at trial as compensation for the taking of or damage to his real property is 30 percent or more greater than the amount of the petitioner's final written offer. The bill further provides that, for owners whose property is taken by condemnation under Title 25.1 or Title 33.2, costs and fees may be awarded where such compensation is 25 percent or more greater than the amount of the condemnor's initial written offer. The provisions of the bill do not apply to condemnation proceedings in which the petitioner filed, prior to July 1, 2016, a petition in condemnation or a certificate of take or deposit. The provisions of § 25.1-245 in effect prior to July 1, 2016, shall govern condemnation proceedings in which a petitioner filed a petition in condemnation or certificate of take or deposit after July 1, 2005, and prior to July 1, 2016.
Title
Eminent domain; reimbursement of costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 6-N) (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 5-N) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 3-N) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate: House substitute with amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 5-N) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 3-N) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0713) | |
2016-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 713 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/28/16 |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB478ER) |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-03-11 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 6-N) |
2016-03-11 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (89-Y 6-N) |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 1-N) |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Conference substitute printed 16106358D-S2 |
2016-03-11 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2016-03-10 | House | Delegates: Habeeb, Minchew, Krizek |
2016-03-10 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senators: Obenshain, Garrett, Deeds |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-10 | House | House requested conference committee |
2016-03-10 | House | House insisted on substitute with amendments |
2016-03-10 | Senate | House substitute with amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) |
2016-03-10 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 5-N) |
2016-03-10 | House | Passed House with substitute with amendments (90-Y 5-N) |
2016-03-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments SB478H1 |
2016-03-10 | House | Amendments by Delegate Habeeb agreed to |
2016-03-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16106208D-H1 |
2016-03-10 | House | Read third time |
2016-03-09 | House | Read second time |
2016-03-07 | House | Committee substitute printed 16106208D-H1 |
2016-03-07 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 2-N) |
2016-02-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 3-N) |
2016-02-17 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-02-17 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB478S1 |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16105458D-S1 |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16105458D-S1 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102425D |