VA SB478 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0653)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0653)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation; contractors; prohibited acts. Provides that a construction contract entered into by a person undertaking work without a valid Virginia contractor's license shall not be enforceable by the unlicensed contractor undertaking the work unless the unlicensed contractor (i) gives substantial performance within the terms of the contract in good faith and (ii) did not have actual knowledge that a license or certificate was required to perform the work for which he seeks to recover payment. This bill is identical to HB 732.
Title
Contractors; work without valid Va. license, prohibited acts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0653) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 653 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-09 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB478ER) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-07 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-06 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2018-03-06 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-03-06 | House | Read third time |
2018-03-05 | House | Read second time |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2018-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB478S1 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18105644D-S1 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18105644D-S1 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104442D |