VA SB490 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0831)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0831)
Summary
No Child Left Behind; withdrawal. Requires the Board of Education to make a recommendation to the General Assembly on whether Virginia should withdraw from the federal No Child Left Behind (NCLB) Act, unless reauthorization of the Elementary and Secondary Education Act provides the necessary revisions in the NCLB Act that allow Virginia's existing educational accountability system, as set forth in the Standards of Quality, Standards of Learning, and Standards of Accreditation, to substantially meet the accountability requirements of the federal law. If the Board recommends withdrawing from participation in NCLB, the Board must develop a plan for withdrawal and must submit such plan to the Governor and the General Assembly for their consideration by June 30, 2009. This bill is identical to
Title
No Child Left Behind Act; Board of Education to make recommendation regard to participation therein.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0831) | |
2008-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 831 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-26 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-24 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-24 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB490ER) | |
2008-03-24 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Reading of conference report waived | |
2008-03-07 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N) | |
2008-03-07 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-29 | House: Delegates: Landes, Tata, Englin | |
2008-02-29 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Senators: Hanger, Whipple, Miller J.C. | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-26 | House: House requested conference committee | |
2008-02-26 | House: House insisted on substitute | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) | |
2008-02-20 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (92-Y 5-N) | |
2008-02-20 | House: Passed House with substitute (92-Y 5-N) | |
2008-02-20 | House: Engrossed by House - floor substitute SB490H2 | |
2008-02-20 | House: Substitute by Delegate Saxman agreed to 084251712-H2 | |
2008-02-20 | House: Floor substitute printed 084251712-H2 (Saxman) | |
2008-02-20 | House: No action taken on Committee substitute 083375748-H1 | |
2008-02-20 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-20 | House: Substitute bill reprinted 083375748-H1 | |
2008-02-19 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-18 | House: Committee substitute printed 083375748-H1 | |
2008-02-18 | House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2008-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB490S1 | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 082935212-S1 | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 082935212-S1 | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-31 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2008-01-31 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 1-N) | |
2008-01-23 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Public Education | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 086210232 |
Same As/Similar To
HB1425 (Same As) 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0826)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB490 |